This case was last updated from Green Lake County Courts on 07/21/2022 at 01:54:24 (UTC).

In the Estate of Michael F. Stachewicz

Case Summary

On 03/07/2003 In the Estate of Michael F Stachewicz was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Green Lake County Courts, Green Lake County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is McMonigal, W. M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0029

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Green Lake, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

McMonigal, W. M

 

Party Details

Decedent

Stachewicz, Michael F.

Not Yet Classified

Stachewicz, Michael A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2004
  • DocketEvent: Closing certificate fiduciaries

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2004
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Michael Stachewicz acknowledges receipt of $38,429.49 and 11 page full account in writing as full payment of his share of estate on April 5, 2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2004
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Deborah Merk acknowledges receipt of $18,429.49 , a satisfactio of mortgage and a copy of Inventory and 11 page full account as full payment of her share of estate on 4/7/04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2004
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2004
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2003
  • DocketEvent: Inventory exhibited

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2003
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Additional Text: Notice to creditors published in Berlin Journal on March 20, 27 and April 2, 2003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2003
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: Notice to Creditors maild to Juliette Manor, Thedar Clark Medical Center, Appleton Cardio Associates, Berlin Memorial Hospital, Dr. Jeffery Carroll, Dr. Barry Rogers and Berlin Hospital Pharmacy on May 16, 2003 by Kathryn Miller

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2003
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2003
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: For appointment of P.R. and waiver of bond signed by Michael A. Stachewicz and Deborah G. Merk.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2003
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: Last date for filing claims 6-9-03.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2003
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2003
  • DocketEvent: Consent to act; Additional Text: Signed by Michael A. Stachewicz, nominated P.R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2003
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.; Court Reporter: Sosinsky, Brenda; Additional Text: To: Michael A. Stachewicz.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2003
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship; Additional Text: Duly made by Michael A. Stachewicz.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2003
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less