This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 06/26/2022 at 12:11:58 (UTC).

In the Estate of Mary R. Harris

Case Summary

On 08/31/2000 In the Estate of Mary R Harris was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Engels, Tari and Dyke, William D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0058

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Engels, Tari

Dyke, William D

 

Party Details

Decedent

Harris, Mary R.

Mineral Point, WI 53565

Not Yet Classified

Clayton, Judith A.

Evanston, IL 60201

James, Merwin

James, Norman R.

Winslow, IL 61089

Gempler, Jackie

Tinges, Margaret

James, Ron

Mcfarland, WI 53558

James, Rick

Dodgeville, WI 53533

Hamilton, Gloria

Newberry, Diane

James, Deb

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Keyes, Dean J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2016
  • DocketEvent: Records scanned; Court Official: Engels, Tari

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2003
  • DocketEvent: Certificate determining estate tax

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2003
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Estate Tax Closing Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2002
  • DocketEvent: Receipt for claim; Additional Text: Patrick Groom

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2002
  • DocketEvent: Order discharging personal representative; Court Official: Engels, Tari

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2002
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Engels, Tari

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2002
  • DocketEvent: Receipt for claim; Additional Text: Pat Groom (copy of cancelled check)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2002
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2002
  • DocketEvent: Waiver, consent and approval; Additional Text: Judith A. Clayton

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2000
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2000
  • DocketEvent: Letters issued; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2000
  • DocketEvent: Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2000
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2000
  • DocketEvent: Judicial transfer; Court Official: Engels, Tari

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2000
  • DocketEvent: Petition for special administration; Court Official: Dyke, William D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2000
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing special administrator; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2000
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2000
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $10.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2000
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keyes, Dean J.