This case was last updated from Shawano County Courts on 07/21/2022 at 21:52:29 (UTC).

In the Estate of Maria F. Kowalski

Case Summary

On 05/09/2003 In the Estate of Maria F Kowalski was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Shawano County Courts, Shawano County Circuit Court located in Trempealeau, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Hoffman, Darlene and Habeck, James R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0062

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Shawano, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Hoffman, Darlene

Habeck, James R

 

Party Details

Decedent

Kowalski, Maria F.

Shawano, WI 54166

Not Yet Classified

Berg, Ann Marie K.

Shawano, WI 54166

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Greenhill, Arnold R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2007
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Additional Text: to Reopen Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2007
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Hoffman, Darlene; Additional Text: to Reopen Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2007
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Hoffman, Darlene

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2004
  • DocketEvent: Closing certificate fiduciaries

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2004
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $27214.73; Additional Text: 2 of 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2004
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: Hoffman, Darlene

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2004
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Hoffman, Darlene

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2004
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: notice to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2004
  • DocketEvent: Final account

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2004
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $70575.54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2003
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2003
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2003
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2003
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2003
  • DocketEvent: Petition for special administration; Court Official: Hoffman, Darlene

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2003
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2003
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2003
  • DocketEvent: Consent to act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2003
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing special administrator; Court Official: Habeck, James R.; Court Reporter: Bostwick, Nina

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2003
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less