This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 06/25/2022 at 20:04:43 (UTC).

In the Estate of Laurin D. Peterson

Case Summary

On 06/16/2000 In the Estate of Laurin D Peterson was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Dyke, William D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0043

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Dyke, William D

 

Party Details

Decedent

Peterson, Laurin D.

Dodgeville, WI 53533

Not Yet Classified

Hennessey, William R.

Dodgeville, WI 53533

Hoesly, Eleanor

Fieldhouse, Nancy

Humbert, Roberta

Dochnahl, Jean

Griffiths, Gary

Griffiths Holman, Debbie

Staskol, Vicki

Byous, Sherry

Hildreth, Joan

Cocking, Frank

Whitford, Sandy

McNeil, LeRoy

McNeil, Earl

Spellman, Janayne

Griffiths, Sam

Belgum, Sandy

Griffiths Stebbins, Rachel

Griffiths, Jeremy

81 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Jackson, Robert J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2004
  • DocketEvent: Order to show cause hearing; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Additional Text: Estate closed today

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2004
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Addendum Final Account

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2004
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from the IRS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2004
  • DocketEvent: Final judgment; Court Official: Dyke, William D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2004
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Dyke, William D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2004
  • DocketEvent: Order discharging personal representative; Court Official: Dyke, William D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2004
  • DocketEvent: Order discharging special administrator; Court Official: Dyke, William D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2004
  • DocketEvent: Order to show cause; Court Official: Dyke, William D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2004
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: of Delinquent Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2000
  • DocketEvent: Order of notice/inter.persons/time to file claims; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2000
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing GAL; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2000
  • DocketEvent: Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2000
  • DocketEvent: Order and notice for hearing; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2000
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $64.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2000
  • DocketEvent: Petition for special administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2000
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing special administrator; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2000
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2000
  • DocketEvent: Other papers

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2000
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jackson, Robert J.