This case was last updated from Green Lake County Courts on 07/20/2022 at 22:49:57 (UTC).

In the Estate of Jon A. Johnson

Case Summary

On 02/27/2003 In the Estate of Jon A Johnson was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Green Lake County Courts, Green Lake County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is McMonigal, W. M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0025

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Green Lake, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

McMonigal, W. M

 

Party Details

Decedent

Johnson, Jon A.

Not Yet Classified

Johnson, Karyn M.

Menomonee Falls, WI 53051

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2004
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.; Court Reporter: Sosinsky, Brenda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2004
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2004
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Atty. contacted, requested FA, Atty. indicated would be extremely difficult to resconstruct FA and that per statute he didn't need to file. Ok w/Judge to close, exhibited inventory/fina account form filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2004
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Copy of letter from Karyn Johnson re: closing out stock. HOld off closing out estate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2004
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Karyn Johnson acknowledges receipt of 1/5 the total estate as full payment of her share of estate on 2/5/04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2004
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Kimberly Merkel acknowledges receipt of 1/5/ total estate as full payment of her share of estate on 6/15/04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2004
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Kathryn Johnson acknowledges receipt of 1/5 total estate as full payment of her share of estate on 2/14/04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2004
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Kenneth Johnson acknowledges receipt of 1/5/ total estate as full payment of his share of estate on 2/7/04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2004
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Christopher Johnson acknowledges receipt of 1/5/ total estate as full payment of his share of estate on 2/6/04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2004
  • DocketEvent: Closing certificate fiduciaries

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2003
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Additional Text: Re: Notice to Creditors.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2003
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.; Court Reporter: Sosinsky, Brenda; Additional Text: To: Karyn M. Johnson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2003
  • DocketEvent: Waiver; Additional Text: Of P.R.'s Bond signed by Christopher A. Johnson, Karyn M. Johnson, Kathryn A. Johnson, Kimberly A. Merkel, and Kenneth A. Johnson.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2003
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2003
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: For intestate administration and appointing of P.R. signed by Karyn M. Johnson, Kimberly A. Merkel, Kenneth A. Johnson, Kathryn A. Johnson, and Christopher A. Johnson.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2003
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: Last date for filing claims is 5-30-03.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2003
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Additional Text: Bond set in the amount of $l00,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2003
  • DocketEvent: Consent to act; Additional Text: Signed by Karyn M. Johnson, nominated P.R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2003
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship; Additional Text: Duly made by Karyn M. Johnson.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2002
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less