This case was last updated from Kewaunee County Courts on 07/24/2022 at 16:53:23 (UTC).

In the Estate of James M. Marcks

Case Summary

On 12/23/2003 In the Estate of James M Marcks was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kewaunee County Courts, Kewaunee County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Schleis, Juliet. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0049

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kewaunee, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Schleis, Juliet

 

Party Details

Decedents

Marcks, James M.

Luxemburg, WI 54217

Marcks, James Melvin

Luxemburg, WI 54217

Marcks, James

Luxemburg, WI 54217

Marcks, Jim

Luxemburg, WI 54217

Not Yet Classified

Marcks, Elizabeth

Luxemburg, WI 54217

Colle, Sue

Luxemburg, WI 54217

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent Attorney

Mehn, Keith A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2005
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's deed; Additional Text: Lot 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's deed; Additional Text: Lot 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's deed; Additional Text: Residence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: Schleis, Juliet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Schleis, Juliet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2005
  • DocketEvent: Closing certificate fiduciaries

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2005
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Signed by Attorney Keith A. Mehn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2005
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Signed by Elizabeth Marcks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2005
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Signed by Sue Colle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2005
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Signed by Elizabeth Marcks and Sue Colle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2003
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2003
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Signed by: Elizabeth Marcks, Brian Marcks, Cathy Lytie, Sue Colle, Barbara Giachino, Joan Koehne and Ann Goubeaux

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2003
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Signed by Donna M. Curley

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2003
  • DocketEvent: Consent to act; Additional Text: Signed by Elizabeth Marcks and Sue Colle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2003
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as trustee; Additional Text: Signed by Elizabeth Marcks and Sue Colle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2003
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2003
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: Creditors' claims must be filed with probate registrar on or before March 23, 2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2003
  • DocketEvent: Letters issued; Court Official: Schleis, Juliet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2003
  • DocketEvent: Trust letters

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2003
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less