This case was last updated from Green Lake County Courts on 07/20/2022 at 11:35:52 (UTC).

In the Estate of Harvey E. Floeter - David Floeter Trust

Case Summary

On 01/24/2003 In the Estate of Harvey E Floeter - David Floeter Trust was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Green Lake County Courts, Green Lake County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is McMonigal, W. M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********64TA

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Green Lake, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

McMonigal, W. M

 

Party Details

Decedent

Floeter, Harvey E.

Not Yet Classified

Floeter, David

Markesan, WI 53946

Nitzke, Brenda

Markesan, WI 53946

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent Attorney

Wilsnack, Jon R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2012
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Nitzke, Brenda; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Brenda Nitzke Current: PO Box 185, 104 E Summit St, Markesan, WI 53946 United States (Effective: 05-11-2012) Prior: P. O. Box # 185, Markesan, WI 53946 United States

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • DocketEvent: Trust receipt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • DocketEvent: Order discharging trustee; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • DocketEvent: Termination of annual accounting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • DocketEvent: Order to show cause; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.; Additional Text: Failure to retunr the Trust Receipt for filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Additional Text: Petition to terminate trust

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.; Additional Text: Order terminating trust

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketEvent: Final account; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.; Court Reporter: Sosinsky, Brenda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • DocketEvent: Notice to make annual filings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2010
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Additional Text: Notice to the Court by Attorney Wilsnack for clarification of the Order of the court arising out of the hearing of July 27, 2010.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2003
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Western Surety Company Bond -- $7500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2003
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Additional Text: Signed by all parties (1) trustee shall pay outstanding debts of David Floeter, (2) shall pay the sum of $200 to David Floeter for clothing, (3) shall pay cost to reinstate ooperating privileges of David Floeter and pay the cost of a six month auto insurance policy, (4) shall distribute 5% of the current value of the trust annually to David Floeter, (5) that no distribution in excess of the 5% annually may be made without Court approval, (6) the bond of trustee shall be amended to $7500.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2003
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.; Court Reporter: Jenson, Deb; Additional Text: Signed by Court approving Stipulation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2003
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.; Court Reporter: Jenson, Deb; Additional Text: Appointing Brenda Nitzke, Trustee for David Floeter, and order for $7500 bond.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2003
  • DocketEvent: Trust letters; Additional Text: Issued to Brenda Nitzke.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2003
  • DocketEvent: Disposed except for annual accounting; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2003
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Additional Text: For Appointment of Trustee for David Floeter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2002
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate; Additional Text: Establishing the trust f/b/o David Floeter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2002
  • DocketEvent: Petition for administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2002
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less