This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 06/26/2022 at 22:27:03 (UTC).

In the Estate of Harvey C. Strangstad

Case Summary

On 10/16/2000 In the Estate of Harvey C Strangstad was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Engels, Tari and Dyke, William D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0067

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Engels, Tari

Dyke, William D

 

Party Details

Decedent

Strangstad, Harvey C.

Dodgeville, WI 53533

Not Yet Classified

Shea, Thea

Mineral Point, WI 53565

Strangstad, Lynette

Strangstad, Jack

Springfield, IL 62704

Shea, Ryan

Shea, Kyle

Kerry Shea Johnson

Johnson, Alex

Johnson, Elliott

Johnson, Cassie

Kruser, Darby

Kruser, Molly

Kruser, Eldon

Kruser, Noah

Shea, Amy

Molitor, Adrian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Frank, Ted N

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • DocketEvent: File microfilmed; Additional Text: Roll 394

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2002
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2002
  • DocketEvent: Supplemental final account

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2002
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2002
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: final - Lynette Strangstad

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2002
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: final - Thea Shea

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2002
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: final - Jack Strangstad

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2002
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2002
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $28582.79; Additional Text: Trust Receipt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2000
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing GAL; Court Official: Engels, Tari

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2000
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing GAL; Court Official: Engels, Tari

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2000
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing GAL; Court Official: Engels, Tari

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2000
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2000
  • DocketEvent: Order of notice/inter.persons/time to file claims; Court Official: Engels, Tari

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2000
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Court Official: Engels, Tari

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2000
  • DocketEvent: Will

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2000
  • DocketEvent: Declination to act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2000
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2000
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank, Ted N