This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 06/25/2022 at 12:32:50 (UTC).

In the Estate of Gordon G. Hardy

Case Summary

On 05/16/2000 In the Estate of Gordon G Hardy was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Dyke, William D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0034

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Dyke, William D

 

Party Details

Decedent

Hardy, Gordon G.

Rewey, WI 53580

Not Yet Classified

Kunz, Patsy L.

Sun Prairie, WI 53590

Patsy Lou Kunz

Hardy, Andrew D.

Hardy, Tami K.

Hardy, David S.

Hardy, Jerry G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Day, Craig R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2001
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2001
  • DocketEvent: Waiver, consent and approval

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2001
  • DocketEvent: Waiver, consent and approval

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2001
  • DocketEvent: Waiver, consent and approval

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2001
  • DocketEvent: Waiver, consent and approval

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2001
  • DocketEvent: Waiver, consent and approval

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2001
  • DocketEvent: Closing certificate fiduciaries

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2001
  • DocketEvent: Receipt for claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2001
  • DocketEvent: Receipt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2000
  • DocketEvent: Waiver, consent and approval

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2000
  • DocketEvent: Waiver, consent and approval

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2000
  • DocketEvent: Oath

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2000
  • DocketEvent: Receipt for perpetual care

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2000
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2000
  • DocketEvent: Order of notice/inter.persons/time to file claims; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2000
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2000
  • DocketEvent: Order for administration; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2000
  • DocketEvent: Letters issued; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2000
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less