This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 07/24/2022 at 16:51:06 (UTC).

In the Estate of Elvin R Scheidecker

Case Summary

On 12/23/2003 In the Estate of Elvin R Scheidecker was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Chippewa, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Stelzner, Katherine and Cameron, Roderick A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0130

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Stelzner, Katherine

Cameron, Roderick A

 

Party Details

Decedents

Scheidecker, Elvin R

Sheidecker, Elvin R

Not Yet Classified

Sheidecker, Paul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Dowling, Gregory P

Sortedahl, Kenneth N.

Gavic, Jorv R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2013
  • DocketEvent: Records scanned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • DocketEvent: Records scanned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2006
  • DocketEvent: Closing certificate fiduciaries

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2006
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: Stelzner, Katherine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2006
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Stelzner, Katherine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2005
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: eight

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2005
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $54351.28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2005
  • DocketEvent: Final account

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2005
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: to Atty Gavic's asst - Julie - re closing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2005
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: e-mail from Julie at Gavic Law - working on today

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2004
  • DocketEvent: Summary assignment affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2004
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $393.0; Additional Text: Dennis Pecha

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2004
  • DocketEvent: Request for substitution; Additional Text: of attorney by special administrator

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2004
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: consent for subsitution of attorneys

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2004
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Cameron, Roderick A.; Additional Text: for substitution of attorneys

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2004
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $4837.11; Additional Text: State of Wisconsin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2003
  • DocketEvent: Petition for special administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2003
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing special administrator; Court Official: Cameron, Roderick A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2003
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued; Court Official: Cameron, Roderick A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2003
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less