This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 07/24/2022 at 16:51:06 (UTC).

In the Estate of Elvin R Scheidecker

Case Summary

On 12/23/2003 In the Estate of Elvin R Scheidecker was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Chippewa, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Stelzner, Katherine and Cameron, Roderick A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0130

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Stelzner, Katherine

Cameron, Roderick A

 

Party Details

Decedents

Scheidecker, Elvin R

Sheidecker, Elvin R

Not Yet Classified

Sheidecker, Paul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Dowling, Gregory P

Sortedahl, Kenneth N.

Gavic, Jorv R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/30/2013

DocketEvent: Records scanned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2013

DocketEvent: Records scanned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2006

DocketEvent: Closing certificate fiduciaries

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2006

DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: Stelzner, Katherine

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2006

DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Stelzner, Katherine

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2005

DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: eight

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2005

DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $54351.28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2005

DocketEvent: Final account

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2005

DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: to Atty Gavic's asst - Julie - re closing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2005

DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: e-mail from Julie at Gavic Law - working on today

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
05/18/2004

DocketEvent: Summary assignment affidavit

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2004

DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $393.0; Additional Text: Dennis Pecha

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2004

DocketEvent: Request for substitution; Additional Text: of attorney by special administrator

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2004

DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: consent for subsitution of attorneys

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2004

DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Cameron, Roderick A.; Additional Text: for substitution of attorneys

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2004

DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $4837.11; Additional Text: State of Wisconsin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2003

DocketEvent: Petition for special administration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2003

DocketEvent: Order appointing special administrator; Court Official: Cameron, Roderick A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2003

DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued; Court Official: Cameron, Roderick A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2003

DocketEvent: Date of death

[+] Read More [-] Read Less