This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 06/26/2022 at 16:42:45 (UTC).

In the Estate of Edwin E. Bendik

Case Summary

On 09/21/2000 In the Estate of Edwin E Bendik was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Dyke, William D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0063

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Dyke, William D

 

Party Details

Decedent

Bendik, Edwin E.

Mineral Point, WI 53565

Not Yet Classified

Bendik, Susan

Mineral Point, WI 53565

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Keyes, Dean J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2005
  • DocketEvent: Microfilm #; Additional Text: #387

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2002
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Petition for Discharge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2002
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: final - Susan L. Bendik

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2002
  • DocketEvent: Order discharging special administrator; Court Official: Dyke, William D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2002
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Dyke, William D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2002
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: of Overdue Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2000
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2000
  • DocketEvent: Petition for special administration; Court Official: Dyke, William D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2000
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing special administrator; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2000
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2000
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $10.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/1999
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keyes, Dean J.