This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 06/25/2022 at 20:26:01 (UTC).

In the Estate of Edgar G. Hellum

Case Summary

On 06/19/2000 In the Estate of Edgar G Hellum was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Dyke, William D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0044

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Dyke, William D

 

Party Details

Decedent

Hellum, Edgar G.

Mineral Point, WI 53565

Not Yet Classified

Stroschein, James

Mineral Point, WI 53565

Goodwieler, Rod

West Branch, IA 52358

Vea, Matthew, jr

Richland, WA 99353

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Pfotenhauer, Peter Joseph

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2000
  • DocketEvent: Receipt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2000
  • DocketEvent: Receipt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2000
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2000
  • DocketEvent: Amended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2000
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2000
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2000
  • DocketEvent: Finding and order (summary proceedings); Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2000
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Dyke, William D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2000
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2000
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $33995.67

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2000
  • DocketEvent: Probate claims notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2000
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2000
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2000
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Court Official: Dyke, William D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2000
  • DocketEvent: Will

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2000
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2000
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $16.38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2000
  • DocketEvent: Order and notice for hearing; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2000
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less