This case was last updated from Kewaunee County Courts on 07/24/2022 at 03:10:02 (UTC).

In the Estate of Dorothy M. Pekarek

Case Summary

On 11/05/2003 In the Estate of Dorothy M Pekarek was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kewaunee County Courts, Kewaunee County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Schleis, Juliet. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0039

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kewaunee, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Schleis, Juliet

 

Party Details

Decedent

Pekarek, Dorothy M.

Kewaunee, WI 54216

Not Yet Classified

Dworak, James E.

Kewaunee, WI 54216

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Dalebroux, Gary J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2005
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's deed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2005
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: Schleis, Juliet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2005
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Schleis, Juliet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2005
  • DocketEvent: Final account

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2005
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2005
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Door County Memorial Hospital in the amount of $2,734.82 - Full satisfaction of claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2005
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Signed by James E. Dworak for Distribution of funds to trust; Dorothy M. Pekarek Revocable Trust per terms of Last Will

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2005
  • DocketEvent: Closing certificate fiduciaries

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2004
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $340.0; Additional Text: Receipt #6917, Inventory Filing Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2004
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2003
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2003
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2003
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: (8) Signed by Margaret M. Funk, Mary Beth Micke, James E. Dworak, Marilyn D. Schlies, Delores M. LaLuzerne, Robert B. Dworak, Cathy S. Buresh, and Jacqueline M. Ronsman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2003
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2003
  • DocketEvent: Consent to act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2003
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2003
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Schleis, Juliet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2003
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $9.0; Additional Text: Receipt #6850: $5.00 Form Fee; $4.00 Certified Copy Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2003
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: FINAL DATE TO FILE CLAIMS: February 6, 2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2003
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dalebroux, Gary J