This case was last updated from Kewaunee County Courts on 07/25/2022 at 02:32:49 (UTC).

In the Estate of Donna Anderegg

Case Summary

On 01/22/2004 In the Estate of Donna Anderegg was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kewaunee County Courts, Kewaunee County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Mleziva, Dennis J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0002

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kewaunee, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Mleziva, Dennis J

 

Party Details

Decedent

Anderegg, Donna

Algoma, WI 54201

Not Yet Classified

Anderegg, Dennis

Algoma, WI 54201

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2004
  • DocketEvent: Order discharging special administrator; Court Official: Mleziva, Dennis J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2004
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Mleziva, Dennis J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2004
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: signed by Michael Fox

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2004
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: signed by Cassandra Fox

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2004
  • DocketEvent: Summary assignment findings and order; Court Official: Mleziva, Dennis J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2004
  • DocketEvent: Summary assignment affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2004
  • DocketEvent: Special administration - petition for discharge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2004
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: signed by Dennis Anderegg

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2004
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: signed by James Anderegg

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2004
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: signed by Robert Anderegg

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2004
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $84.0; Additional Text: Receipt # 6906 Check # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2004
  • DocketEvent: Petition for summary assignment; Court Official: Mleziva, Dennis J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2004
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2004
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: signed by Nyel Anderegg, Jr., Dennis Anderegg, Robert Anderegg, and James Anderegg

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2004
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: signed by Cassandra Fox and Mike Fox

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2004
  • DocketEvent: Consent to act; Additional Text: signed by Dennis Anderegg

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2004
  • DocketEvent: Summary assignment notice to creditors; Additional Text: The property may be assigned to the creditors and persons interested on or after March 15, 2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2004
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2003
  • DocketEvent: Will

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2003
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less