This case was last updated from Green Lake County Courts on 07/20/2022 at 10:10:24 (UTC).

In the Estate of Dean A. Wickman

Case Summary

On 01/20/2003 In the Estate of Dean A Wickman was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Green Lake County Courts, Green Lake County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is McMonigal, W. M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0011

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Green Lake, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

McMonigal, W. M

 

Party Details

Decedent

Wickman, Dean A.

Not Yet Classified

Wickman, Patricia A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Sias, Michael E

Osowski, Beth D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2006
  • DocketEvent: Special administration - petition for discharge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2006
  • DocketEvent: Order discharging special administrator; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2006
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Patricia A. Wickman Current: 302 County Park Rd, Waupun, WI 53963 United States Prior: W2035 Taylor Lee Lane, Green Lake, WI 54941 United States

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2006
  • DocketEvent: Petition for special administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2006
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing special administrator; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2006
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued; Additional Text: Patricia Wickman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2006
  • DocketEvent: Change of class code; Additional Text: WCIS Class Code changed from 50105 (Summary assignment) to 50104 (Special administration).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2006
  • DocketEvent: Reopen; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2003
  • DocketEvent: Summary assignment findings and order; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.; Court Reporter: Sosinsky, Brenda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2003
  • DocketEvent: Amended; Additional Text: Order & Notice for Hearing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2003
  • DocketEvent: Order and notice for hearing; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.; Court Reporter: Sosinsky, Brenda; Additional Text: Hearing on Petition for Summary Assignment set for February 25, 2003. Property may be assigned to Creditors & Interested persons on or after March 25, 2003.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2003
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing special administrator; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.; Court Reporter: Sosinsky, Brenda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2003
  • DocketEvent: Consent to act; Additional Text: Signed by Patricia A. Wickman.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2003
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued; Additional Text: To: Patricia A. Wickman.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2003
  • DocketEvent: Summary assignment affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2003
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship; Additional Text: Duly made by Patricia A. Wickman.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2003
  • DocketEvent: Petition for summary assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2003
  • DocketEvent: Will filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2002
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less