This case was last updated from Kewaunee County Courts on 07/22/2022 at 18:11:45 (UTC).

In the Estate of Carolyn M. Alberts

Case Summary

On 07/17/2003 In the Estate of Carolyn M Alberts was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kewaunee County Courts, Kewaunee County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Schleis, Juliet and Mleziva, Dennis J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0024

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kewaunee, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Schleis, Juliet

Mleziva, Dennis J

 

Party Details

Decedent

Alberts, Carolyn M.

Casco, WI 54205

Not Yet Classified

Alberts, Mose L.

Casco, WI 54205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent Attorney

Abts, Dennis J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2004
  • DocketEvent: Final account

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2004
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: signed by Mose L. Alberts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2004
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's deed; Additional Text: Affidavit of Correction filed with P.R. Deed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2004
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: Schleis, Juliet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2004
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Schleis, Juliet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2004
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $275000.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2004
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2003
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2003
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2003
  • DocketEvent: Petition waiving fiduciary income tax return; Court Official: Mleziva, Dennis J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2003
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2003
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Signed by Mose L. Alberts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2003
  • DocketEvent: Consent to act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2003
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2003
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2003
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: Creditors's claims must be filed with the probate registrar on or before October 17, 2003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2003
  • DocketEvent: Letters issued; Court Official: Schleis, Juliet; Additional Text: Domicliary Letters issued to Mose L. Alberts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2003
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $9.0; Additional Text: Receipt No. 6802 in the sum of $9.00 for $5.00 form fee and $4.00 certified copy fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2002
  • DocketEvent: Will filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2002
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abts, Dennis J