This case was last updated from Kewaunee County Courts on 07/23/2022 at 00:01:12 (UTC).

In the Estate of Brandon L. Giudice

Case Summary

On 08/04/2003 In the Estate of Brandon L Giudice was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kewaunee County Courts, Kewaunee County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Mleziva, Dennis J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0028

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kewaunee, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Mleziva, Dennis J

 

Party Details

Decedent

Giudice, Brandon L.

Kewaunee, WI 54216

Not Yet Classified

Giudice, Diane K.

Kewaunee, WI 54216

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2005
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $12.0; Additional Text: Copies of file (12) pages requested by Steven J. Prueher.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2004
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: signed by Diane Giudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2004
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: signed by Steven J. Giudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2004
  • DocketEvent: Order discharging special administrator; Court Official: Mleziva, Dennis J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2004
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Mleziva, Dennis J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2004
  • DocketEvent: Special administration - petition for discharge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2004
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $21.0; Additional Text: Receipt #6984, $21.00 Filing Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2004
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $17.0; Additional Text: Receipt # 6936 Check # 100 Certified copies for $12.00 and Form fee for $5.00 paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2003
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $1.0; Additional Text: Receipt #6824, $1.00 copy fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2003
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Inquiry from Research Services International, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2003
  • DocketEvent: Petition for special administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2003
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing special administrator; Court Official: Mleziva, Dennis J; Court Reporter: Baux, Nancy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2003
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2003
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less