This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 06/26/2022 at 08:01:54 (UTC).

In the Estate of Amos Arnold

Case Summary

On 08/11/2000 In the Estate of Amos Arnold was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Dyke, William D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0054

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Dyke, William D

 

Party Details

Decedent

Arnold, Amos

Arena, WI 53503

Not Yet Classified

Arnold, Danny

Sauk City, WI 53583

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Frank, Ted N

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2001
  • DocketEvent: Receipt for claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2001
  • DocketEvent: Amended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2001
  • DocketEvent: Order discharging special administrator; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2001
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Dyke, William D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2001
  • DocketEvent: Other papers

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2001
  • DocketEvent: Petition for special administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2001
  • DocketEvent: Death certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2001
  • DocketEvent: Change of class code; Court Official: Dyke, William D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2001
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing special administrator; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2001
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2001
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $10.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2000
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $268.74

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2000
  • DocketEvent: Will; Court Official: Dyke, William D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2000
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank, Ted N