This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 07/24/2022 at 16:51:10 (UTC).

In the Estate of Alvina R Verhoeven

Case Summary

On 12/23/2003 In the Estate of Alvina R Verhoeven was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Chippewa, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Stelzner, Katherine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0129

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Stelzner, Katherine

 

Party Details

Decedent

Verhoeven, Alvina R

Not Yet Classified

Swoboda, Ronald

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Kostner, Richard J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2015
  • DocketEvent: Records scanned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • DocketEvent: Receipt for claim; Additional Text: Midelfort Clinic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: Stelzner, Katherine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Stelzner, Katherine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2004
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: copy of canceled ck from Mark Lee Anderson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2004
  • DocketEvent: Closing certificate fiduciaries

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2004
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: copy from Atty Kostner to Mark Lee Anderson re: cashing check

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2004
  • DocketEvent: Final account

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2004
  • DocketEvent: Receipt and release; Additional Text: two

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2004
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2004
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2004
  • DocketEvent: Consent to act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2004
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Stelzner, Katherine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2004
  • DocketEvent: Letters issued; Court Official: Stelzner, Katherine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2004
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Stelzner, Katherine; Additional Text: no appearances

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2003
  • DocketEvent: Order of notice/inter.persons/time to file claims; Court Official: Stelzner, Katherine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2003
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2003
  • DocketEvent: Will

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2003
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2003
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less