This case was last updated from Kewaunee County Courts on 07/22/2022 at 22:11:06 (UTC).

In the Estate of Alvin W. Nitsch

Case Summary

On 07/29/2003 In the Estate of Alvin W Nitsch was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kewaunee County Courts, Kewaunee County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Schleis, Juliet. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0027

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kewaunee, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Schleis, Juliet

 

Party Details

Decedent

Nitsch, Alvin W.

Kewaunee, WI 54216

Not Yet Classified

Rehak, Ruth

Kewaunee, WI 54216

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Messmann, Douglas J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2004
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's deed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2004
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: Schleis, Juliet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2004
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Schleis, Juliet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2004
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2004
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2004
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2004
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: signed by Ruth Rehak in the amount of $20,913.69 for specific bequests pursuant to Will

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2004
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: signed by Diane Grabow in the amount of $10,913.70 for specific bequest pursuant to Will

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2004
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: signed by Michelene Ferron in the amount of $10,913.70 for specific bequest pursuant to Will

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2004
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: signed by Ruth Rehak in the amount of $1,123.00 for Personal Representative fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2003
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Signed by Grace J. French

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2003
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Signed by Muriel Stochke

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2003
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Signed by Diane Grabow

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2003
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Signed by Michelene Ferron

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2003
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2003
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2003
  • DocketEvent: Consent to act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2003
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2003
  • DocketEvent: Letters issued; Court Official: Schleis, Juliet; Additional Text: Appoints Ruth Rehak Personal Representative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2003
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Messmann, Douglas J