This case was last updated from Shawano County Courts on 07/20/2022 at 21:26:37 (UTC).

In re the Joseph J. Pirc Testamentary Trust

Case Summary

On 02/21/2003 In re the Joseph J Pirc Testamentary Trust was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Shawano County Courts, Shawano County Circuit Court located in Trempealeau, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Hoffman, Darlene and Habeck, James R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********077A

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Shawano, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Hoffman, Darlene

Habeck, James R

 

Party Details

Decedent

Pirc, Joseph J.

Shawano, WI 54166

Not Yet Classified

Pirc, Sandra

Milwaukee, WI 53209

Pirc, Jeremy

Milwaukee, WI 53209

Moran, Kathleen

Waukesha, WI 53189

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2009
  • DocketEvent: Termination of annual accounting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2009
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from accountant stating trust not required to file tax returns.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2009
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Habeck, James R.; Additional Text: to Terminate Trust

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2009
  • DocketEvent: Order discharging trustee; Court Official: Hoffman, Darlene

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Order to show cause hearing on October 5, 2009 at 04:00 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2009
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: accountant's request for additional time to complete trust tax filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Beneficiary, Jeremy Pirc (fax)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • DocketEvent: Trust receipt; Amount: $11814.26; Additional Text: 1 of 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Additional Text: to Terminate Trust

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • DocketEvent: Final account

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2009
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: to Make Annual Filing (overdue)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2008
  • DocketEvent: Trustee accounts; Amount: $11706.8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2008
  • DocketEvent: Notice of overdue report or annual account

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2007
  • DocketEvent: Trustee accounts; Amount: $13752.22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2007
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: US Bank called, stating that verification of assets will be provided to TE in 3 - 5 days. AAC will be filed within 7 - 10 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2006
  • DocketEvent: Annual account filed; Amount: $13473.45; Court Official: Hoffman, Darlene

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • DocketEvent: Annual account filed; Amount: $13113.81; Court Official: Hoffman, Darlene

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2004
  • DocketEvent: Trustee accounts; Amount: $12867.29; Court Official: Hoffman, Darlene

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2003
  • DocketEvent: Trust inventory; Amount: $12822.21; Court Official: Hoffman, Darlene

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2003
  • DocketEvent: Disposed except for annual accounting; Court Official: Hoffman, Darlene

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less