This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 01/16/2022 at 20:05:42 (UTC).

Ford Motor Credit Company vs. Richard Reed

Case Summary

On 12/22/2003 Ford Motor Credit Company filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Richard Reed. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Chippewa, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Isaacson, Jim and Anderl, Julie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1676

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Isaacson, Jim

Anderl, Julie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ford Motor Credit Company

Defendant

Reed, Richard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cerasoli, Steven J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/25/2004

DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2004

DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Additional Text: Mailed to Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2004

JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for replevin; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2003SC001676; Caption: Ford Motor Credit Company vs. Richard Reed; Total Amount: $325.8; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Default Judgment - Collateral per Replevin Judgment on file; Judgment Party; Party Name: Ford Motor Credit Company; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: Po Box 64400, Colorado Springs, CO 80961; Judgment Party; Party Name: Richard Reed; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 706 Olive St, Chippewa Falls, WI 54729; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $82.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $188.8; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $50.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2004

DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim; Additional Text: Return Date Hearing; Minutes, filed. Default Judgment granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2004

DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2004

DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: of Default

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2004

DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim; Additional Text: Replevin Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2004

DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: on Richard Reed - $98.60

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2004

DocketEvent: Amended summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2004

DocketEvent: Judicial transfer; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2004

DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: copy mailed back to Atty for personal service or publication

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2004

DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Anderl, Julie; Additional Text: Return Date Hearing; Minutes, filed. Late service - must amend for new court date.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2004

DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Service on Richard Reed - Cost?

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2003

DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $82.0; Additional Text: 03R 017323

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2003

DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Filing Fee $82

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2003

DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Personal Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less