This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 01/16/2022 at 21:27:56 (UTC).

First Federal Capital Bank vs. John R Dahl

Case Summary

On 12/26/2003 First Federal Capital Bank filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against John R Dahl. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderl, Julie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1692

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Anderl, Julie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

First Federal Capital Bank

605 State Street

Lacrosse, WI 54701

Defendant

Dahl, John R

Eau Claire, WI 54702-0553

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2004
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2004
  • DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Anderl, Julie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2004
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Additional Text: Mailed to Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2004
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2003SC001692; Caption: First Federal Capital Bank vs. John R Dahl; Total Amount: $2039.39; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Default Judgment; Judgment Party; Party Name: First Federal Capital Bank; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 605 State Street, LaCrosse, WI 54701; Judgment Party; Party Name: John R Dahl; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO Box 553, Eau Claire, WI 54702-0553; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1953.39; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $82.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $4.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2004
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Anderl, Julie; Additional Text: Return Date Hearing; Minutes, filed. Default Judgment granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2004
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Anderl, Julie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2004
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Amended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2004
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Regular mail $2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2004
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Must serve by 3/26/04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2004
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2004
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification; Additional Text: ORIGINAL ADDRESS INFO for John R Dahl Prim. Addr. : 16982 54th Ave Sec. Addr. : City : Chippewa Falls State : WI Zip : 54729 Country : United States

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2003
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Filing Fee $82

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2003
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $84.0; Additional Text: 03R 017441

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2003
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Regular mail $2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less