This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 01/16/2022 at 21:27:53 (UTC).

First Federal Capital Bank vs. David T Rose

Case Summary

On 12/26/2003 First Federal Capital Bank filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against David T Rose. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Vernon, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Isaacson, Jim. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1693

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Isaacson, Jim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

First Federal Capital Bank

Defendant

Rose, David T

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2004
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2004
  • DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2004
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Additional Text: Mailed to Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2003SC001693; Caption: First Federal Capital Bank vs. David T Rose; Total Amount: $1059.0; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Default Judgment; Judgment Party; Party Name: First Federal Capital Bank; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 605 State Street, La Crosse, WI 54601; Judgment Party; Party Name: David T Rose; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 136 1/2 S Stone St, Augusta, WI 54720; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $945.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $82.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $32.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim; Additional Text: Return Date Hearing; Minutes, filed. Default Judgment granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2004
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: Service on David T. Rose - $30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2004
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification; Additional Text: ORIGINAL ADDRESS INFO for David T Rose Prim. Addr. : 3121 Runway Ave Sec. Addr. : City : Eau Claire State : WI Zip : 54703 Country : United States

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2004
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Additional Text: on David T Rose

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2004
  • DocketEvent: Judicial transfer; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2004
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Personal service on David T Rose. 2 authenticated copies sent to EC Sheriff in envelope provided. 1 copy returned to First Federal/Caroline

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2004
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2004
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Must serve by 3/26/04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2003
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Filing Fee $82

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2003
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $84.0; Additional Text: 03R 017441

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2003
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Regular mail $2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less