This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 01/16/2022 at 22:53:35 (UTC).

EZ Auto Credit Inc vs. Pamela J Heath

Case Summary

On 12/29/2003 EZ Auto Credit Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Pamela J Heath. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Chippewa, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Anderl, Julie and Isaacson, Jim. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1695

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Anderl, Julie

Isaacson, Jim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EZ Auto Credit Inc

Defendant

Heath, Pamela J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketEvent: Satisfaction of judgment fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: 15R 015764

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketEvent: Satisfaction of judgment due to bankruptcy; Additional Text: Application for Order of Satisfaction of Judgment Due to Bankruptcy Discharge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Swnson law Group -re: Application for Order of Satisfaction of Judgment Due to Bankruptcy Discharge.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2004
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2004
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Additional Text: Mailed to Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2004
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for replevin; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2003SC001695; Caption: EZ Auto Credit Inc vs. Pamela J Heath; Total Amount: $137.0; Satisfaction: Full; Property/Remarks: Default Judgment - Collateral per Replevin Judgment on file; Judgment Party; Party Name: EZ Auto Credit Inc; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 5503 Business Hwy 51S, Schofield, WI 54476; Judgment Party; Party Name: Pamela J Heath; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2703 Eddy Ln, Eau Claire, WI 54702; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $82.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $25.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $25.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2015-09-04; Type: Satisf of judg due to bankrupt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2004
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of substitute service; Additional Text: on Pamela Heath - $25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2004
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Anderl, Julie; Additional Text: Return Date Hearing; Minutes, filed. Default Judgment granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2004
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Anderl, Julie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2004
  • DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Anderl, Julie; Additional Text: Replevin Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2004
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Personal Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2004
  • DocketEvent: Change of class code; Additional Text: WCIS Class Code changed from 31001 (Sm Claim, Claim Under $ Limit) to 31003 (Small Claims, Replevin).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2004
  • DocketEvent: Judicial transfer; Court Official: Anderl, Julie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2004
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of substitute service; Additional Text: on Pamela J. Heath - original

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2004
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of substitute service; Additional Text: copy of - on Pamela J. Heath - $25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2004
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Copy of Chapter 7 Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention by Pam Heath

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2004
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim; Additional Text: Return Date Hearing; Minutes, filed. Vehicle has been surrendered. Adjourned - need reaffirmation agreement.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2003
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2003
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $82.0; Additional Text: 03R 017488

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2003
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Personal Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less