This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 01/15/2022 at 06:12:24 (UTC).

E-Z Auto Credit Inc vs. Rex J Bignell et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2003 E-Z Auto Credit Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Rex J Bignell. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Isaacson, Jim. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1458

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Isaacson, Jim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

E-Z Auto Credit Inc

2127 State Hwy 53

Chippewa Falls, WI 54729

Defendants

Bignell, Rex J

Annandale, MN 55302

Bignell, Nicole L

Annandale, MN 55302

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2003
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2003
  • DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2003
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Additional Text: Mailed to Defendants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2003
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2003SC001458; Caption: E-Z Auto Credit Inc vs. Rex J Bignell et al; Total Amount: $2174.0; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Default Judgment; Judgment Party; Party Name: E-Z Auto Credit Inc; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2127 State Hwy 53, Chippewa Falls, WI 54729; Judgment Party; Party Name: Nicole L Bignell; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO box 27, 6278 Mitchell Ave NW, Annandale, MN 55302; Judgment Party; Party Name: Rex J Bignell; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO Box 27, 6278 MItchell Ave NW, Annandale, MN 55302; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1957.94; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $82.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $65.2; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $63.86; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2003
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Additional Text: Cost - $63.86

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2003
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim; Additional Text: Return Date Hearing; Minutes, filed. Default Judgment granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2003
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2003
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Amended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2003
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Personal Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2003
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of non-service; Additional Text: for Bignells - $65.20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2003
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim; Additional Text: Return Date Hearing; Minutes, filed. No service - will file amended.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2003
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Filing Fee $82

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2003
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $82.0; Additional Text: 03R 014917

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2003
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Personal Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less