This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 01/16/2022 at 20:05:23 (UTC).

Clear Choices Inc vs. Mindy Kroeplin

Case Summary

On 12/22/2003 Clear Choices Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Mindy Kroeplin. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Chippewa, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Isaacson, Jim. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1683

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Isaacson, Jim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clear Choices Inc

Defendant

Kroeplin, Mindy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/10/2007

DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Clear Choices Inc; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Clear Choices Inc Current: PO Box 413, Stillwater, MN 55082 United States Prior: PO Box 553, Stillwater, MN 55082 United States

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2004

DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2004

DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2004

DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Additional Text: Mailed to Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2004

JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2003SC001683; Caption: Clear Choices Inc vs. Mindy Kroeplin; Total Amount: $685.7; Property/Remarks: Default Judgment; Judgment Party; Party Name: Clear Choices Inc; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO Box 413, Stillwater, MN 55082; Judgment Party; Party Name: Mindy Kroeplin; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO Box 42, Cadott, WI 54727; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $601.7; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $82.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2004

DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim; Additional Text: Return Date Hearing; Minutes, filed. Default Judgment granted.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2004

DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2003

DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $84.0; Additional Text: 03R 017365

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2003

DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Filing Fee $82

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2003

DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Regular mail $2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less