This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 01/16/2022 at 20:05:29 (UTC).

Clear Choices Inc vs. John T Reedy

Case Summary

On 12/22/2003 Clear Choices Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against John T Reedy. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Chippewa, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Sazama, Thomas and Isaacson, Jim. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1681

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Sazama, Thomas

Isaacson, Jim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clear Choices Inc

Defendant

Reedy, John T

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/10/2007

DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Clear Choices Inc; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Clear Choices Inc Current: PO Box 413, Stillwater, MN 55082 United States Prior: Po Box 553, Stillwater, MN 55082 United States

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2007

DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: completed by Mr. Reedy filed with the Court. Copy mailed to pltf.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2007

DocketEvent: Warrant/Capias/Commitment served for Reedy, John T; Court Official: Sazama, Thomas; Additional Text: Warrant quashed by fax, hard copy in box.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2007

DocketEvent: Return on warrant; Court Official: Sazama, Thomas

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2007

DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Sazama, Thomas; Additional Text: of Commitment w/ corrected birthdate

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2006

DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Clear Choices with corrected info on Mr. Reedy

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2006

DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: to Clear Choices regarding wrong info for warrant. CO returned from Sheriff's Dept.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2006

DocketEvent: Commitment issued for Reedy, John T; Court Official: Sazama, Thomas

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2006

DocketEvent: Change of address notification; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for John T Reedy Current: 108 E 6th Avenue, Stanley, WI 54768 United States Prior: N15069 Hart Ave, Stanley, WI 54768 United States

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2006

DocketEvent: Contempt order; Court Official: Sazama, Thomas

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
03/23/2006

DocketEvent: Judicial transfer; Court Official: Sazama, Thomas

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2004

DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2004

DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2004

DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Additional Text: Mailed to Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2004

JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2003SC001681; Caption: Clear Choices Inc vs. John T Reedy; Total Amount: $810.7; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Default Judgment; Judgment Party; Party Name: Clear Choices Inc; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO Box 413, Stillwater, MN 55082; Judgment Party; Party Name: John T Reedy; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 108 E 6th Avenue, Stanley, WI 54768; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $726.7; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $82.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2004

DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim; Additional Text: Return Date Hearing; Minutes, filed. Default Judgment granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2004

DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2003

DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $84.0; Additional Text: 03R 017365

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2003

DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Filing Fee $82

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2003

DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Regular mail $2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less