This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 01/16/2022 at 20:05:36 (UTC).

Clear Choices Inc. vs. Jason Heuer

Case Summary

On 12/22/2003 Clear Choices Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jason Heuer. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Chippewa, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Sazama, Thomas and Anderl, Julie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1680

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Sazama, Thomas

Anderl, Julie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clear Choices Inc.

Defendant

Heuer, Jason

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/10/2007

DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Clear Choices Inc.; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Clear Choices Inc. Current: PO Box 413, Stillwater, MN 55082 United States Prior: P.O. Box 553, Stillwater, MN 55082 United States

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2006

DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Warrant returned.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2006

DocketEvent: Warrant/Capias/Commitment served for Heuer, Jason; Court Official: Sazama, Thomas; Additional Text: Quashed CO by fax, copy to Sheriff. Completed FDS filed in court file..copy to Pltf.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2006

DocketEvent: Commitment issued for Heuer, Jason; Court Official: Sazama, Thomas

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2006

DocketEvent: Contempt order; Court Official: Sazama, Thomas

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2006

DocketEvent: Contempt hearing; Court Official: Sazama, Thomas; Additional Text: Minutes, filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2006

DocketEvent: Motion and order for hearing on contempt; Court Official: Anderl, Julie

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2006

DocketEvent: Judicial transfer; Court Official: Sazama, Thomas

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2004

DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2004

DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Anderl, Julie

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2004

DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Additional Text: Mailed to Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2004

JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2003SC001680; Caption: Clear Choices Inc. vs. Jason Heuer; Total Amount: $409.0; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Default Judgment; Judgment Party; Party Name: Clear Choices Inc.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO Box 413, Stillwater, MN 55082; Judgment Party; Party Name: Jason Heuer; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 3474 250th Street, Cadott, WI 54727; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $325.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $82.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2004

DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Anderl, Julie; Additional Text: Return Date Hearing; Minutes, filed. Default Judgment granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2004

DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Anderl, Julie

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2003

DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $84.0; Additional Text: 03R 017365

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2003

DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Filing Fee $82

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2003

DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Regular mail $2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less