This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 01/16/2022 at 20:05:39 (UTC).

Chase Manhattan Bank vs. John Andre

Case Summary

On 12/22/2003 Chase Manhattan Bank filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against John Andre. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Chippewa, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderl, Julie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1678

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Anderl, Julie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chase Manhattan Bank

Defendant

Andre, John

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sowinski, Jareth J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/04/2004

DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2004

DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Additional Text: Mailed to Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2004

JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for replevin; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2003SC001678; Caption: Chase Manhattan Bank vs. John Andre; Total Amount: $191.5; Property/Remarks: Default Judgment - Collateral per Judgment for Possession of Collateral on file; Judgment Party; Party Name: Chase Manhattan Bank; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 900 Stewart Ave 4th Flf, USA N.A., Garden City, NY 11530; Judgment Party; Party Name: John Andre; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 8258 County Highway T, P.R. Estate Bradley C Andre, Chippewa Falls, WI 54729; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $82.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $59.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $50.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2004

DocketEvent: Adjourned return date; Additional Text: Minutes; filed. Default Judgment granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2004

DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Anderl, Julie

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2004

DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Anderl, Julie; Additional Text: for Possession of Collateral

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2004

DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Anderl, Julie; Additional Text: Return Date Hearing; Minutes, filed. Adjourned to 2/2/04.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2004

DocketEvent: Proof of service; Additional Text: of Summons For Consumer Replevin on John Andre

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2004

DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: Affidavit of Cost and As To Non-Military Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2003

DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $82.0; Additional Text: 03R 017339

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2003

DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Filing Fee $82

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2003

DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Personal Service--Given to CCSD for service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less