This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 01/16/2022 at 22:53:39 (UTC).

Archer Lion Inc vs. Michael J Beranek

Case Summary

On 12/29/2003 Archer Lion Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Michael J Beranek. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Chippewa, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Isaacson, Jim. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1694

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Isaacson, Jim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Archer Lion Inc

Defendants

Beranek, Michael J

Beranek Construction

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2012
  • DocketEvent: Satisfaction of judgment fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: 12R 007013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • DocketEvent: Satisfaction of judgment due to bankruptcy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2004
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2004
  • DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2004
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Additional Text: Mailed to Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2004
  • DocketEvent: Transcript of judgment issued; Additional Text: for filing in Eau Claire County - copy of

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2004
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2003SC001694; Caption: Archer Lion Inc vs. Michael J Beranek; Total Amount: $1370.09; Satisfaction: Full; Property/Remarks: Default Judgment; Judgment Party; Party Name: Archer Lion Inc; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 3621 - 129th St, Chippewa Falls, WI 54729; Judgment Party; Party Name: Michael J Beranek; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 166 Hoover Ct, Fall Creek, WI 54742; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1232.68; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $82.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $30.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $5.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Pre-judgment interest; Amount: $15.41; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2004-01-26; Type: Transcript issued; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2012-04-17; Type: Satisf of judg due to bankrupt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2004
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: Service on Michael J. Beranek - $30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2004
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim; Additional Text: Return Date Hearing; Minutes, filed. Default Judgment granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2004
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2003
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim; Additional Text: Filing Fee $82

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2003
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $82.0; Additional Text: 03R 017451

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2003
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Personal Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less