This case was last updated from Green Lake County Courts on 07/20/2022 at 10:12:53 (UTC).

Apple Steel Rule Die Co Inc vs. Flexible Fabrication

Case Summary

On 01/20/2003 Apple Steel Rule Die Co Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Flexible Fabrication. This case was filed in Green Lake County Courts, Green Lake County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Slate, Mark T. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0003

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2003

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Green Lake, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Slate, Mark T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Apple Steel Rule Die Co Inc

Defendant

Flexible Fabrication

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Franckowiak, Jason John

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketEvent: Mandatory Efiling Case Conversion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • DocketEvent: Judicial transfer; Court Official: Slate, Mark T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2003
  • JudgementJudgement type: Transcript of Judgment; County: GREEN LAKE; Case number: 2003TJ000003; Caption: Apple Steel Rule Die Co Inc vs. Flexible Fabrication; Total Amount: $1297.34; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Transcript of Judgment filed from Milwaukee County - case number 02SC14542. Date of Judgment - June 13, 2002.; Judgment Party; Party Name: Apple Steel Rule Die Co Inc; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 7817 W Clinton Ave, Milwaukee, WI 53233; Judgment Party; Party Name: Flexible Fabrication; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 24 James Rd, Markesan, WI 53946; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1292.34; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2003
  • DocketEvent: Transcript of judgment filed; Additional Text: from Milwaukee County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2003
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less