This case was last updated from Brown County Wisconsin Courts on 02/09/2022 at 15:18:43 (UTC).

Y&D Corp vs. Erick Anthony Peck

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 Y D Corp filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Erick Anthony Peck. This case was filed in Brown County Wisconsin Courts, Brown County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Resar, Chad. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4475

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Brown, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Resar, Chad

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Y&D Corp

2641 Eaton Road

Green Bay, WI 54311

Dorsch Ford

Green Bay, WI 54311

Defendant

Peck, Erick Anthony

Green Bay, WI 54304

Garnishee

Weigt Industries Inc

N941 Craftsmen Dr

Greenville, WI 54942

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patteson, Ann Louise

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 003507, Payable Number: 342326, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 003507, Payable Number: 342326, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Appearance of filing agent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: BROWN; Case number: 2021SC004475; Caption: Y&D Corp vs. Erick Anthony Peck; Total Amount: $10266.5; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Erick Anthony Peck; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1011 14th Ave., Green Bay, WI 54304 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Y&D Corp; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2641 Eaton Road, Green Bay, WI 54311 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $10000.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Resar, Chad; Additional Text: 02:29 PM Attorney Ann Louise Patteson in court for Plaintiff Y&D Corp. Defendant Erick Anthony Peck not in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Resar, Chad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Resar, Chad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Resar, Chad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 033130, Payable Number: 338997, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 031092, Payable Number: 337289, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patteson, Ann Louise