This case was last updated from Brown County Wisconsin Courts on 01/22/2022 at 19:23:06 (UTC).

Wisconsin Public Service Corporation vs. Ken Becker & Sons, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Wisconsin Public Service Corporation filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Ken Becker Sons, Inc. This case was filed in Brown County Wisconsin Courts, Brown County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Walsh, Thomas J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0439

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Brown, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Walsh, Thomas J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wisconsin Public Service Corporation

700 N Adams Street

Green Bay, WI 54301

Defendant

Ken Becker & Sons, Inc.

W197 N7555 F&W Court

Lannon, WI 53046

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Case, Annemarie Dorothy

Defendant Attorney

Stewart, Edward W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Walsh, Thomas J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Walsh, Thomas J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Additional Text: for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Telephone scheduling conference on September 7, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Telephone scheduling conference on July 27, 2021 at 01:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 013853, Payable Number: 323476, Receipt Number: 21R 019117, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Russell Becker, Registered Agent 4/23/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $167.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 010536, Payable Number: 320813, Amount: $167.50

    Read MoreRead Less