This case was last updated from Marathon County Courts on 08/21/2021 at 13:29:20 (UTC).

Wisconsin Auto Finance Inc dba CNAC of Wausau vs. Eric Von Bergmann

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 Wisconsin Auto Finance Inc dba CNAC of Wausau filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Eric Von Bergmann. This case was filed in Marathon County Courts, Marathon County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacobson, LaMont K and Marcus, Sandra J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1014

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Marathon, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Jacobson, LaMont K

Marcus, Sandra J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wisconsin Auto Finance Inc dba CNAC of Wausau

2600 N 20Th Ave

Wausau, WI 54401

Defendant

Bergmann, Eric Von

Merrill, WI 54452

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: on Eric Von Bergmann w/NEJ - Not Deliverable as Addressed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 136532, Payable Number: 266588, Receipt Number: 21R 004575P, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: MARATHON; Case number: 2021SC001014; Caption: Wisconsin Auto Finance Inc dba CNAC of Wausau vs. Eric Von Bergmann; Total Amount: $5300.26; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Eric Von Bergmann; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 811 N State St, Merrill, WI 54452 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Wisconsin Auto Finance Inc dba CNAC of Wausau; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2600 N 20th Ave, Wausau, WI 54401 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $5136.24; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $49.52; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $20.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Marcus, Sandra J.; Additional Text: Case called 10:00 time block in Courtroom A. Clerk: Gina. Wisconsin Auto Finance appears by zoom. Eric Von Bergmann does not appear. Default JU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Marcus, Sandra J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Marcus, Sandra J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Marcus, Sandra J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return Date on August 11, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: on Eric Von Bergmann w/NOH - Not Deliverable as Addressed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Additional Text: by Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of non-service; Additional Text: on Eric Bergmann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return Date on July 21, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by sheriff; Additional Text: Copies to Pltf for service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 115819, Payable Number: 264815, Receipt Number: 21R 003527P, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Affidavit Regarding Defendant's Military Status for: Eric Von Bergman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Proof from the Department of Defense

    Read MoreRead Less