This case was last updated from Sheboygan County Courts on 01/22/2022 at 02:32:06 (UTC).

West Coast Servicing, Inc. vs. Maria F. Heiser et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 West Coast Servicing, Inc filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Maria F Heiser. This case was filed in Sheboygan County Courts, Sheboygan County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Borowski, Daniel J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0060

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Sheboygan, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Borowski, Daniel J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

West Coast Servicing, Inc.

7911 Warner Ave

Huntington Beach, CA 92647

Defendants

Heiser, Maria F.

Cedar Grove, WI 53013-1656

Heiser, Christopher J.

Cedar Grove, WI 53013-1656

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Piette, Robert M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order Declined; Additional Text: (signed 12-15-21) defts filed bankruptcy, proceedings have been stayed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confirmation of sale; Court Official: Borowski, Daniel J; Court Reporter: Tape Recorder; Additional Text: **Not on the Record** Court stayed all proceedings based on bankruptcy filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: requesting to cancel hearing set for 12-14-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Sheriff's report of sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion, and affidavit; Additional Text: Affidavit in Support of Motion to Confirm Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $17500.0; Additional Text: 21R 020296

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment; Court Official: Borowski, Daniel J; Additional Text: (signed 04-23-21) 6 month redemption No Deficiency judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Additional Text: for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Maria F. Heiser

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Christopher J. Heiser

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Borowski, Daniel J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 002471, Payable Number: 350104, Receipt Number: 21R 003164, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: attachment to complaint: Note & Mortgage

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Piette, Robert M