This case was last updated from Waukesha County Courts on 01/31/2022 at 23:14:29 (UTC).

West Bend Mutual Insurance Company vs. Accent Exteriors Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 West Bend Mutual Insurance Company filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Accent Exteriors Inc. This case was filed in Waukesha County Courts, Waukesha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Herring, David and Paz, Monica. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0112

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Waukesha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Herring, David

Paz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

West Bend Mutual Insurance Company

1900 S. 18Th Ave.

West Bend, WI 53095

Defendant

Accent Exteriors Inc.

N57 W35561 Misty Terrace

Oconomowoc, WI 53066

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Case, Dorothy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 005384, Payable Number: 429412, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WAUKESHA; Case number: 2021SC000112; Caption: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company vs. Accent Exteriors Inc.; Total Amount: $819.18; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Accent Exteriors Inc.; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: N57 W35561 Misty Terrace, Oconomowoc, WI 53066 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1900 S. 18th Ave., West Bend, WI 53095 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $603.68; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $46.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $50.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Herring, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Paz, Monica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Herring, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Herring, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Service made of Authenticated Summons and Complaint; Electronic Filing Notice as to Accent Exteriors, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Paz, Monica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001690, Payable Number: 426982, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Amount on complaint:$ 603.68 Declaration of nonmilitary service as to: Service as to: All Cost of Service and/or Publication: $46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims Information sheet to be attached to all copies of Summons and Complaint for service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims And Eviction Exhibit Process Information Sheet, to be attached to all small claims forms for service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Case, Dorothy