This case was last updated from Manitowoc County Courts on 01/25/2022 at 00:46:36 (UTC).

West Bend Mutual Insurance Company et al vs. Viktor Andreiev et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 West Bend Mutual Insurance Company filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Viktor Andreiev. This case was filed in Manitowoc County Courts, Manitowoc County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Dewane, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0415

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Manitowoc, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Dewane, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

West Bend Mutual Insurance Company

1900 South 18Th Avenue

West Bend, WI 53095

Defendants

Andreiev, Viktor

Waynesville, OH 45068

Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC

2200 S. 75Th Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85043

Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings Inc.

20002 N. 19Th Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85027

Not Yet Classified

Bayland Transport, Inc.

3150 Twilight Lane

Green Bay, WI 54311

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McNally, Patrick Dennis

Defendant Attorney

Groenewold, Joel David

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • HearingDescription: Scheduling conference; Court Official: Dewane, Robert; Location: Manitowoc County Courthouse, Br. 3, Rm. 212; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Scheduling conference on February 16, 2022 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Atty. Joel D. Groenewold

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion; Additional Text: Motion to Dismiss Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc. file by Atty. Joel D. Groenewold

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: of Filing, of Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Acknowledgment; Additional Text: Acknowledgment of involuntary plaintiff Bayland Transport, Inc. re service of summons and complaint and e-filing notice (dated 11-8-2021).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Service from New Castle County (DE) Sheriff's Office on Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings Inc.'s registered agent (served 11-3-2021).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: to R.D. from Attorney Patrick D. McNally, re: mediation.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Attorney Joel D. Groenewold appears on behalf of defendants, Viktor Andrewiev, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, and Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: of Filing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury demand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury fee paid; Amount: $72.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 205804, Payable Number: 151632, Receipt Number: 21R 014507, Amount: $72.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Scheduling conference on December 13, 2021 at 04:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Summons and Compaint, etc., served on Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC., on 10/19/2021. $35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 187419, Payable Number: 151269, Receipt Number: 21R 013862, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less