This case was last updated from Brown County Wisconsin Courts on 01/22/2022 at 01:09:04 (UTC).

West Bend Mutual Insurance Company et al vs. Tom Metzler et al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2021 West Bend Mutual Insurance Company filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Tom Metzler. This case was filed in Brown County Wisconsin Courts, Brown County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Hinkfuss, Timothy A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0182

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Brown, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Hinkfuss, Timothy A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

West Bend Mutual Insurance Company

1900 South 18Th Avenue

West Bend, WI 53095

Defendants

Metzler, Tom

New Franken, WI 54229

ABC Insurance Company

518 E Broad St

Columbus, OH 43215

State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company

518 E Broad St

Columbus, OH 43215

Not Yet Classified

Harold Tauschek & Sons Excavating & Snow Removal, Inc.

58 Gauthier Rd.

New Franken, WI 54229

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McNally, Patrick Dennis

Defendant Attorneys

Bukowski, Sean A.

Bandt, Christopher Robert

Malloy, Mark Dennis

Tokarz, Brian Charles

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Additional Text: for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Order for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Hinkfuss, Timothy A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Hinkfuss, Timothy A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter to the court re case settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense; Additional Text: Defendant State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Acknowledgment; Additional Text: Acknowledgment of Service of Amended Summons and Complaint on State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company by Attorney Mark Malloy (dated 7/1/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Scheduling data sheet; Additional Text: Defendant State Auto's Scheduling Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Hinkfuss, Timothy A; Additional Text: to Correct Party Name and Amend Caption

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company Current: 518 E Broad St, Columbus, OH 43215 United States (Effective: 06-24-2021) Prior: fictitiously named insurer, Milwaukee, WI 53205 US

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 007027, Payable Number: 317914, Receipt Number: 21R 009014, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: of Tom Metzler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Acknowledgment; Additional Text: Acknowledgment of involuntary plaintiff Harold Tauschek & Sons Excavating & Snow Removal, Inc. - NOT DATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: upon Tom Metzler - February 16, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Response/reply; Additional Text: of Tom Metzler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 004148, Payable Number: 315833, Receipt Number: 21R 005828, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bukowski, Sean A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bandt, Christopher Robert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Malloy, Mark Dennis