This case was last updated from Juneau County Courts on 01/24/2022 at 16:17:40 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. vs. AGNIESZKA H. MOCZYDLOWSKA A/K/A AGNES H. MOCZYDLOW...et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against AGNIESZKA H MOCZYDLOWSKA A/K/A AGNES H MOCZYDLOW. This case was filed in Juneau County Courts, Juneau County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, Stacy A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0178

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Juneau, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, Stacy A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

3476 Stateview Blvd.

Fort Mill, SC 29715

Defendants

MOCZYDLOWSKA A/K/A AGNES H. MOCZYDLOWSKA, AGNIESZKA H.

Lyndon Station, WI 53944

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF AGNIESZKA H. MOCZYDLOWSKA A/K/A AGNES H.

Lyndon Station, WI 53944

POPLAWSKA, BEATA K.

Lyndon Station, WI 53944

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BEATA K. POPLAWSKA

Lyndon Station, WI 53944

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cummings, Shannon Kathleen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Additional Text: Summons published in the Juneau County Star Times on 11/04, 11/11 and 11/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Due Diligence on Beata K. Poplawska

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Attempted Service on Unknown Spouse of Agnieszka

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Attempted Service on Beata K. Poplawska

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Agnieszka H. Moczydlowska (9/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Attempted Service on Unknown Spouse of Beata

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Attempted Service on Unknown Spouse of Beata

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Attempted Service on Beata

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: On 10/27/2021 a copy of the Publication Summons and Summons & Complaint were mailed to Beata Poplawska and Unknown Spouse.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Publication summons; Additional Text: Filed by Atty Cummings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Lis pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 088013, Payable Number: 128187, Receipt Number: 21R 006852, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cummings, Shannon Kathleen