This case was last updated from Brown County Wisconsin Courts on 02/05/2022 at 02:38:58 (UTC).

WE Windsor Heights LLC vs. Nwobidiaso P. Iloeje

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 WE Windsor Heights LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Nwobidiaso P Iloeje. This case was filed in Brown County Wisconsin Courts, Brown County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Burke, Paul. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1929

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Brown, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Burke, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WE Windsor Heights LLC

1010 N Cass St

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendants

Iloeje, Nwobidiaso P.

Green Bay, WI 54303

Iloeje, Nwobidaso Paul

Green Bay, WI 54303

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hammond, Kim M

Gollnick, James W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 016086, Payable Number: 325043, Receipt Number: 21R 021448, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: BROWN; Case number: 2021SC001929; Caption: WE Windsor Heights LLC vs. Nwobidiaso P. Iloeje; Total Amount: $2384.21; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Nwobidiaso P. Iloeje; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 401 12th Ave, Green Bay, WI 54303 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: WE Windsor Heights LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1010 N Cass St, Milwaukee, WI 53202 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $2111.71; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $8.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Burke, Paul; Additional Text: 01:46 PM Attorney James W Gollnick appeared by video means for Plaintiff WE Windsor Heights LLC. Defendant Nwobidiaso P. Iloeje not in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Burke, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Burke, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Burke, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certified mail service; Additional Text: to Nwobidiaso lloeje, returned signed by Cheryl L Walczak on 5/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by certified mail; Additional Text: Certified Mail #7019 2280 0001 4766 8656

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $122.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 012168, Payable Number: 321926, Receipt Number: 21R 016320, Amount: $122.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on May 28, 2021 at 01:45 pm. Due to the COVID-19, THIS HEARING WILL TAKE PLACE BY VIDEO AND TELEPHONE CONFERENCING DO NOT APPEAR IN PERSON. You may join this hearing by video using the following website: https://wicourts.zoom.us/j/91103314385?pwd=MHRNY0ZZVHF5YkJQVFJRY0FxN3p1Zz09 (Meeting ID: 911 0331 4385 Password: 295754) or you may join this hearing by telephone by calling 1-312-626-6799 and entering the same meeting ID and password. Please be advised that there are many cases scheduled on the Courts calendar during this time period so you may be required to remain in a Virtual Waiting Room until your case is called. Please be sure that your device has sufficient battery life for this possibility. This matter will not be adjourned by the court except upon formal motion for good cause or with specific approval of the court upon stipulation by all parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gollnick, James W