This case was last updated from Sawyer County Courts on 01/24/2022 at 10:07:29 (UTC).

Voluntary Amortization of Debts of Vince Ruff et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 Voluntary Amortization of Debts of Vince Ruff was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in Sawyer County Courts, Sawyer County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Yackel, John M and Smeltzer, Rod W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0116

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sawyer, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Yackel, John M

Smeltzer, Rod W

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Ruff, Vince

Hayward, WI 54843

Ruff, Misty

Hayward, WI 54843

Not Yet Classified

Heights Finance Corporation

2605 W College Ave

Appleton, WI 54914

Christine Meyers

Appleton, WI 54914

Lein Law Offices LLP

Po Box 761

Hayward, WI 54843

Trustee

Martin, Mont

Milwaukee, WI 53226

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Lein, Matthew Curtiss

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Smeltzer, Rod W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Yackel, John M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: cover letter for default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal; Additional Text: of Amortization of Debt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Right to Cure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: cover letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Report; Additional Text: of Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Court Official: Yackel, John M.; Additional Text: Amortization Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Yackel, John M.; Additional Text: for amortization of debt plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition granted; Court Official: Yackel, John M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Yackel, John M.; Additional Text: Appointing Trustee and Enjoining Creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: to Amortize Debts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $51.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 002577, Payable Number: 67927, Receipt Number: 21R 004839, Amount: $51.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: of Debts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Appointing Trustee and Enjoining Creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lein, Matthew Curtiss