This case was last updated from Monroe County Wisconsin Courts on 01/23/2022 at 04:50:58 (UTC).

Voluntary Amortization of Debts of Katie Goetzka

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 Voluntary Amortization of Debts of Katie Goetzka was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in Monroe County Wisconsin Courts, Monroe County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Goodman, Mark L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0100

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Monroe, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Goodman, Mark L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Goetzka, Katie

Kendall, WI 54638

Trustee

Hoyerman, Richard S.

Green Bay, WI 54324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Fields, Jeffrey K

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Report; Additional Text: Of Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: A - The Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Goodman, Mark L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other; Court Official: Goodman, Mark L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Letter regarding Creditor's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Goodman, Mark L.; Additional Text: Appointing Trustee and Enjoining Creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Additional Text: Petition To Amortize Indebtedness

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $51.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 003839, Payable Number: 162206, Receipt Number: 21RT002015, Amount: $51.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: Affidavit Of Debts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Order Appointing Trustee and Enjoining Creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fields, Jeffrey K