This case was last updated from Winnebago County Courts on 02/01/2022 at 03:10:21 (UTC).

Verve, A Credit Union vs. Elyssa J Berry et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 Verve, A Credit Union filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Elyssa J Berry. This case was filed in Winnebago County Courts, Winnebago County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Keberlein, Bryan D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0215

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Winnebago, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Keberlein, Bryan D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Verve, A Credit Union

Po Box 310

Fond Du Lac, WI 54936

Defendants

Berry, Chad A

Oshkosh, WI 54904

Berry, Elyssa J

Oshkosh, WI 54904

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Endejan, Frank J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 114867, Payable Number: 297044, Receipt Number: 21R 006851, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WINNEBAGO; Case number: 2021SC000215; Caption: Verve, A Credit Union vs. Elyssa J Berry et al; Total Amount: $6896.46; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Elyssa J Berry; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 4981 Fisk Ave., Oshkosh, WI 54904 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Chad A Berry; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 4981 Fisk Ave., Oshkosh, WI 54904 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Verve, A Credit Union; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO Box 310, Fond du Lac, WI 54936 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $6622.96; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $24.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.; Additional Text: Default judgment granted. NEJ/Judgment with FDS mailed to parties. Plaintiff Verve, A Credit Union and Attorney Frank J Endejan not in court. Defendant Elyssa J Berry not in court. Defendant Chad A Berry not in court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on February 24, 2021 at 11:00 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Additional Text: $6,622.96 / Summons and Complaint mailed to DE 01-25-2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $118.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 055929, Payable Number: 294799, Receipt Number: 21R 002346, Amount: $118.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Endejan, Frank J