This case was last updated from Monroe County Wisconsin Courts on 01/21/2022 at 18:16:31 (UTC).

U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as Trustee vs. Karri L. Carpenter-Harris et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 U S Bank Trust National Association, as Trustee filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Karri L Carpenter-Harris. This case was filed in Monroe County Wisconsin Courts, Monroe County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Ziegler, Todd L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0017

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Monroe, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Ziegler, Todd L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as Trustee

55 Beattie Place, Suite 110

Greenville, SC 29601

Defendants

Carpenter-Harris, Karri L.

Sparta, WI 54656

Midland Funding LLC

C/O Corporation Service Co. - Reg Agent, 8040 Excelsior Drive, #400

Madison, WI 53717

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gratz, Codi C.

Comella, Matthew

Hillmann, Shawn R

Thoms, Emily E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Ziegler, Todd L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Ziegler, Todd L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Additional Text: Plaintiff's Petition for Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter dated March 29, 2021 to Judge Ziegler from Atty Comella re: Hearing cancellation request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Additional Text: Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment of Foreclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit in support of motion; Additional Text: Affidavit in Support Motion for Judgment of Foreclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for judgment/prop. judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Midland Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Karri L. Carpenter-Harris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certified copy of lis pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 000496, Payable Number: 159137, Receipt Number: 21RT000332, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gratz, Codi C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Comella, Matthew

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thoms, Emily E.