This case was last updated from Wood County Wisconsin Courts on 02/04/2022 at 12:19:24 (UTC).

Us. Bank National Association vs. FRANCIS L MORGAN

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 Us Bank National Association filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against FRANCIS L MORGAN. This case was filed in Wood County Wisconsin Courts, Wood County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Kreuser, Jacalyn A, Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr and Joosten, Cindy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0488

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Wood, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Kreuser, Jacalyn A

Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr

Joosten, Cindy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Us. Bank National Association

1000 Cliff Mine Road, Suite 330

Pittsburgh, PA 15275

Defendant

MORGAN, FRANCIS L

Wisconsin Rapids, WI 54495

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

O'Connor, Chela Bordas

Duplay, Crystal

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WOOD; Case number: 2021SC000488; Caption: Us. Bank National Association vs. FRANCIS L MORGAN; Total Amount: $3222.41; Judgment Party; Party Name: FRANCIS L MORGAN; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2640 BONOW AVE, Wisconsin Rapids, WI 54495 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Us. Bank National Association; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1000 Cliff Mine Road, Suite 330, Pittsburgh, PA 15275 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $2787.91; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $170.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Kreuser, Jacalyn A; Additional Text: 02:37 PM Attorney Luke Weiland in court for Plaintiff Us. Bank National Association. Defendant FRANCIS L MORGAN not in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Kreuser, Jacalyn A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Amount: $85.0; Additional Text: 10/11/21; Francis Morgan; S&C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Amount: $2787.91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr.; Additional Text: Send as nothing had been commenced in case since June 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Amount: $85.0; Additional Text: Francis Morgan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Adjourned return date; Court Official: Kreuser, Jacalyn A; Additional Text: 01:55 PM Attorney Luke Weiland in court for Plaintiff Us. Bank National Association. Defendant FRANCIS L MORGAN not in court. Adjourned until 07/06/21 for service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Amount: $2787.91; Additional Text: $2,787.91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 005138, Payable Number: 126542, Receipt Number: 21R 004778, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Duplay, Crystal

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'Connor, Chela Bordas