This case was last updated from Waupaca County Courts on 02/02/2022 at 21:21:09 (UTC).

UHG I, LLC vs. SARA VANLANEN

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 UHG I, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against SARA VANLANEN. This case was filed in Waupaca County Courts, Waupaca County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Nielsen, Troy L, Vedral, Doreen and Tews, Terrie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0184

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Waupaca, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Nielsen, Troy L

Vedral, Doreen

Tews, Terrie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UHG I, LLC

6400 Sheridan Drive, Suite 138

Williamsville, NY 14221

Defendant

VANLANEN, SARA

Fremont, WI 54940

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mackelly, Meghan Patricia

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Transcript of judgment issued; Additional Text: to be filed in Outagamie County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 014386, Payable Number: 155348, Receipt Number: 21R 006884, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 014386, Payable Number: 155348, Receipt Number: 21R 006884, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: Received unsigned from defendant, with note reading "please start garnishment process."

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 009399, Payable Number: 153838, Receipt Number: 21R 004327, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Tews, Terrie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Nielsen, Troy L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WAUPACA; Case number: 2021SC000184; Caption: UHG I, LLC vs. SARA VANLANEN; Total Amount: $2757.32; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: SARA VANLANEN; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 7778 MAPLE LN, Fremont, WI 54940 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: UHG I, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 6400 SHERIDAN DRIVE, SUITE 138, Williamsville, NY 14221 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $2485.82; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $116.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-11-10; Type: Transcript issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Vedral, Doreen; Additional Text: Atty. Mackelly appeared by letter. No appearance by defendant. Default judgment entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Vedral, Doreen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 006780, Payable Number: 153022, Receipt Number: 21R 002453, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney; Additional Text: Letter of Appearance and request for Judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mackelly, Meghan Patricia