This case was last updated from Brown County Wisconsin Courts on 02/05/2022 at 23:35:06 (UTC).

UHG I, LLC vs. NATHAN DAVIS

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 UHG I, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against NATHAN DAVIS. This case was filed in Brown County Wisconsin Courts, Brown County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Resar, Chad and Burke, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2898

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Brown, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Resar, Chad

Burke, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UHG I, LLC

6400 Sheridan Drive, Suite 138

Buffalo, NY 14221

Defendant

DAVIS, NATHAN

De Pere, WI 54115

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stueckroth, Richard E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Resar, Chad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Resar, Chad; Court Reporter: Maroszek/Shimek/Dewick; Additional Text: 9:40am Plaintiff UHG I, LLC not in court. Defendant NATHAN DAVIS in court. Attorney Richard E Stueckroth not in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Richard E Stueckroth -forwarded to Commissioner Resar -Request for out of state witness to appear by phone is granted. Thanks, CDR 12/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Hearing on December 13, 2021 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Dobberstein Law routed to Comm Resar No objection has been received. Please reschedule the hearing to 12/13/21 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom D and generate notice. Thanks, CDR 10/28/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Adjourned return date; Court Official: Resar, Chad; Additional Text: 01:29 PM Defendant NATHAN DAVIS in court. Attorney Richard E Stueckroth in court for Plaintiff UHG I, LLC. Hearing scheduled for November 8, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Hearing on November 8, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Burke, Paul; Additional Text: 01:15 PM Defendant NATHAN DAVIS in court. Attorney Richard E Stueckroth in court for Plaintiff UHG I, LLC. Adjourned return date scheduled for September 15, 2021 at 01:15 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Adjourned return date on September 15, 2021 at 01:15 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 018794, Payable Number: 327327, Receipt Number: 21R 025702, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stueckroth, Richard E