This case was last updated from Waukesha County Courts on 02/08/2022 at 03:08:08 (UTC).

TW Kimberly LLC vs. John Treacy

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 TW Kimberly LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against John Treacy. This case was filed in Waukesha County Courts, Waukesha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Herring, David and Paz, Monica. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2805

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Waukesha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Herring, David

Paz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TW Kimberly LLC

W229 N1433 Westwood Drive

Waukesha, WI 53186

Defendant

Treacy, John

Mukwonago, WI 53149

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sengstock, Marcus J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 045046, Payable Number: 452762, Receipt Number: 21R 049899, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WAUKESHA; Case number: 2021SC002805; Caption: TW Kimberly LLC vs. John Treacy; Total Amount: $2629.83; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: TW Kimberly LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: W229 N1433 Westwood Drive, Waukesha, WI 53186 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: John Treacy; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 620 Oldfield Ave, Mukwonago, WI 53149; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $2144.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $71.33; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $300.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Paz, Monica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Herring, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Herring, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Herring, David; Court Reporter: Recorded Hearing; Additional Text: 09:28 AM Attorney Marcus J Sengstock in court for Plaintiff TW Kimberly LLC. Defendant John Treacy not in court. Case called for second cause. Court orders default judgment in favor of the plaintiff and against the defendant in the amount of $2,144.00 plus costs and statuatory attorneys fees.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: Filed by Atty Sengstock

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of publication; Additional Text: Filed as to 11-22-21 return date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Damage list; Additional Text: Itemization of Damages Filed by Atty Sengstock

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Treacy, John; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for John Treacy Current: 620 Oldfield Ave, Mukwonago, WI 53149 United States (Effective: 10-14-2021) Prior: 410 Kimberly Drive #18, Waukesha, WI 53188 US

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: As to John Treacy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of posting; Additional Text: Service by Posting, filed by Atty Sengstock. Posting and Mailing made of Authenticated Summons and Complaint for Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Herring, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 036459, Payable Number: 447460, Receipt Number: 21R 040005, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: 5 day Notice of Termination of Tenancy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Amount on complaint:$ 845.00 Declaration of nonmilitary service as to: John Treacy Service as to: John Treacy (via posting) All Cost of Service and/or Publication: $45.00/ $26.33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims Information sheet to be attached to all copies of Summons and Complaint for service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims And Eviction Exhibit Process Information Sheet, to be attached to all small claims forms for service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sengstock, Marcus J